+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 725 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB470ER)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 961431388-H2
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 961431388-H2
- House and Senate sub. rej. by conference comm.
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Earley, Williams, Goode
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Delegates: Orrock, Hall, Hull
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 965577388-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 965577388-S1
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 965577388-S1
- Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 961385388-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 961385388-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961385388-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (21-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 963028388
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 97-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor