+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 65 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB470ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101971D