+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 344 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB47ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/02/03 046403484
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor