+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103777D
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor