+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
- Enacted, Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB468ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 064025129-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB468ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065159164
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor