+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2003 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Substitute bill reprinted 023284946-H1
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 023284946-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 023284946-H1
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 023284946-H1
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Referred from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 023732946
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2002: Continued to 2003 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2002: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2002: Referred from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor