+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB465ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100996D
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor