+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB463ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (92-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100632D