+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB461ER)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Putney)
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065158164
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor