+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reconsideration by Natural Resources Subcommittee by voice vote
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100348D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor