+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB460ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request for second conference committee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Watkins, Lucas, Puller
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates: Kilgore, Jones, Spruill
- Conference substitute printed 14105529D-H2
- Second conference report agreed to by House (75-Y 22-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 22-N 1-A)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested second conference committee (38-Y 2-Y)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate amendment rejected by House (5-Y 85-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 85-N 1-A)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Watkins, Lucas, Puller
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Kilgore, Jones, Spruill
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 21-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104663D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 14104663D-EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB460EH1
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104663D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101016D