+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/12)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB460ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105707D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105707D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB460S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105707D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #2
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102883D
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor