+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB46ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/24/97 985803492
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor