+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB46ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 16106314D-H2
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 10-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Carrico, Lucas, Newman
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates: Greason, Robinson, Tyler
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider insisting on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 16105802D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB46S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105802D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105802D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB46H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16103691D-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16103691D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation
On November 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100918D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 11, 2016: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 10-N)
March 9, 2016: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2016: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
March 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2016: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
February 9, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor