+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB46ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105296D-S1 (93-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB46S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105296D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105296D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100908D