+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB457ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 005388208
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2000: Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor