+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
On January 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102167D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2020: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Kathleen Murphy
Type:
Primary Sponsor