+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB455ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB455H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105254D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105254D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103896D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N 1-A)
March 1, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2022: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N)
February 3, 2022: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor