+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
On April 11, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 371 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB454ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 983147815-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983147815
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor