+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N)
- Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Amendments by Delegate Sickles agreed to
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104908D-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Toscano rejected
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB45EH1
- Printed as engrossed 14104908D-EH1
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104908D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Appointments
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101173D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor