+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB449ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 983135809-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (28-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983135809
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (28-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor