+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0893)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 893 (effective-see bill)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB447ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. Hall agreed to
- Title replaced
- Printed as engrossed LD8809260 (HB447E)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor