+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4912376 (HB445E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented and ordered printed