+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0301)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 301 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB444ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103504D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor