+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 289 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB443ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 001364821-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 001364821-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 001364821-H1
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from M. & P. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 1
On January 17, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 002931821
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2000: Reported from M. & P. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor