+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB441ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD5714376 (HB441E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented and ordered printed