+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB440ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Read second time
- Amendments by Del. Morgan agreed to
- Reengrossed by House as amended
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4325364 (HB440E)
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute/with amds.
- Amendments by Del. Morgan agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4325364 (HB440H2)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amendments by Del. Morgan agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4316364 (HB440H1)
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (13-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor