+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB44ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB44H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105123D-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105123D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Special Workers Comp
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101131D
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 15, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
February 2, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor