+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB44ER)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 964714208-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964714208-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964714208-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 967811208-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967811208-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 967811208-H1
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 966560208
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor