+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB44ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process
On December 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082304720
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor