+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (13-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amendment by Mr. Wilkins withdrawn
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/ands. 989679488-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 989679488-EH1
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989679488-H1
- Amendments by Mr. Wilkins agreed to
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989679488-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (27-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 984446488
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (13-Y 4-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (27-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor