+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 794 (effective 4/6/96)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB437ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 964447360-H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 964447360-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964447360-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 963480360
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from General Laws with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor