+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982169128-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (79-Y 20-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982169128
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (29-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor