+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 582 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB434ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N)
- Read third time and passed House (71-Y 27-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 081014640-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB434E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (16-Y 5-N)
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081014640
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N)
February 8, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (16-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor