+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB434ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Sewell, Bell, Campbell, R.R.
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Boysko, Stuart
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 22107162D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB434S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22107162D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22107162D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB434H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106437D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106437D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102666D