+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB432ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Title replaced
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB432ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 986852128-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Woods agreed to 986869128-S2
- Floor substitute printed 986869128-S2 (Woods)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 986869128-S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 986852128-S1
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 982229128-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 982229128-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (76-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 982229128-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982174128
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor