+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 902 (effective 7/1/98)
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB431ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recom. # 1,2,3 & 5 (0-Y 99-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 99-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recom. #4,6,7,8,9 & 10 (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recom.#4,6,7,8.9 & 10 (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB431ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Finance committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Education & Health committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Couric agreed to
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Couric withdrawn
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 4-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 982230128-H1
- Amendment by Mr Bennett agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd 982230128-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 982230128-EH1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (82-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 982230128-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 9-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982170128
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 99-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 4-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor