+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB428ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 3-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101285D
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2016: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 23, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 3-N)
February 9, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor