+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 23, 1998 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (28-Y 69-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 69-N)
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (61-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (61-Y 38-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB427ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (81-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Woods agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (25-Y 13-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 986786212-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (76-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986786212
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (61-Y 38-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 69-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (25-Y 13-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor