+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0901)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 901 (effective 7/1/98)
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB426ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. # 1,2,3,& 4 (97-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation # 5 (0-Y 100-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recom. #1 thru 4 (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB426ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 982231212-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 982231212-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 982231212-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986784212
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 100-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor