+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB424ER)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 14-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Marsh, Edwards, Stolle
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Delegates: Ruff, Kilgore, Deeds
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 85-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (4-Y 85-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (12-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (90-Y 2-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 990480442-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 990480442-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 983196442
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee substitute printed 990480442-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On November 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (28-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 983196442