+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105746D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB424H1
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105746D-H1
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1
On January 6, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102771D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor