+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
On April 2, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 528 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB422ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 964847396-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964847396-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964847396-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (16-Y 3-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 967138396
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Finance with sub. (16-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor