+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (7-Y 8-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 046575544
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2004: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (7-Y 8-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor