+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (26-Y 4-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (15-Y 8-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983109152