+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 69 (effective 3/4/96)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB418ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 964849396-E
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds 964849396-E
- Amendments by Mr. Parrish agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 964849396-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964849396-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 964836396
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Finance with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor