+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB417ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB417H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104306D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104306D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100869D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor