+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 987616432-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 987616432-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 987616432-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981758432
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: Reported from Claims with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor