+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 280 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB409ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101756D
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor