+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
On January 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100442D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Karrie K. Delaney
Type:
Primary Sponsor